skip to content

Potter, Charles Peter

CPSO#: 25676

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jan 2021
EXPIRY DATE
26 Jan 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C.P. Potter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: 15 Runnymede Crescent London ON, N6G 1Z7
Date Received: 26 Jan 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Mar 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jan 2021

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 30, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Charles Peter Potter to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 30, 2017:

Dr. Potter has restricted his practice to addiction medicine.