THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:23:47 AM
Potter, Charles Peter
CPSO#:
25676
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C.P. Potter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:15 Runnymede Crescent
London ON, N6G 1Z7
Date Received: 26 Jan 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Mar 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jan 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 30, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Charles Peter Potter to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 30, 2017:
Dr. Potter has restricted his practice to addiction medicine.