skip to content

Podbielski, Dominik Waclaw

CPSO#: 90862

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eye Care Specialists of Saskatchewa
106 Victoria Ave E 2nd Floor
Regina SK  S4N 0P3
Phone: (306) 546-5201

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dominik W Podbielski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DOMINIK WACLAW PODBIELSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PODBIELSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014