THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:19:33 PM
Podbielski, Dominik Waclaw
CPSO#:
90862
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2224 Walker Rd
Suite 200
Windsor ON N8W 5L7
Phone: 5199041414
Fax: 5192530801
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOMINIK WACLAW PODBIELSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PODBIELSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |