skip to content

Plantive, Richard

CPSO#: 87572

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
Department of Emergency Medicine
713 chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4212 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

PO Box 17046
1937 Portobello Blvd.
Orléans, ON
K4A 4W8
Orléans ON  K4A 4W8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Plantive Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Plantive ( CPSO# 87572 )

Business Address:
Hopital Montfort
Department of Emergency Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
1937 Portobello Boulevard
PO Box 17046
Ottawa ON  K4A 4W8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD PLANTIVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLANTIVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2015 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2015 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007