THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 7:21:36 AM
Plantive, Richard
CPSO#:
87572
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD PLANTIVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLANTIVE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2015 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2015 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2007 |