skip to content

Phua, Chai Wye

CPSO#: 97252

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malay

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
E6-220
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd E, London
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58342
Fax: (519) 685-8294 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C.W. Phua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Phua ( CPSO# 97252 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Room E6-220
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6H 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:30 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHAI WYE PHUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHUA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Feb 2012 to 09 Mar 2012
EL - Hepatology/Liver Transplantation

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
EL - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015