THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 17:35:40 PM
Phua, Chai Wye
CPSO#:
97252
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Malay
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
E6-220
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd E, London
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58342
Fax: (519) 685-8294
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:30 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHAI WYE PHUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHUA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Feb 2012 to 09 Mar 2012
EL - Hepatology/Liver Transplantation
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2015 |