skip to content

Pettle, Alvin

CPSO#: 22872

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Aug 1995

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
3910 Bathurst Street
M3H5Z3
Toronto ON  M3H5Z3
Phone: (416) 633-4101
Fax: (416) 633-9254 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:11 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1995
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 1995
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 10 Feb 1999
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 04 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 02 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 21 May 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 21 May 2021 Active
 
(1 of 2)

As from May 21, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Alvin Pettle in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Pettle to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. ALVIN PETTLE
("Dr. Pettle")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Pettle, certificate of registration number 22872, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1115202 (the "Investigation") into my office administration practices in my obstetrics and gynecology practice.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Pettle, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Clinical Supervision 

(a)	I, Dr. Pettle, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision").

(b)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 

(i)	Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "B";

(ii)	Review the materials provided by the College and have an orientation session with me, including to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;

(iii)	Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month;

(iv)	Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting, including at least eight (8) charts which must be new consultations;

(v)	Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;

(vi)	Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations; 

(vii)	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(viii)	Submit one (1) written report to the College at the end of the period of Clinical Supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

(c)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d)	I, Dr. Pettle, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(e)	I, Dr. Pettle, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f)	I, Dr. Pettle, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(g)	I, Dr. Pettle, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  

(h)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(6)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Pettle, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Review, reflection, written summary, and discussion with Clinical Supervisor of the following: 

1.	Uninsured Services: Billing and Block Fees, CPSO Policy; 

2.	OMA Guide to Uninsured Services, 2021 edition; and

(ii)	any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Pettle, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months of the date I sign this undertaking.

(d)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(7)	Reassessment of Practice

(a)	I, Dr. Pettle, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (6) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment will include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, at least eight (8) of which must be new consultations, and may include: direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b)	I, Dr. Pettle, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 

(c)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 

(d)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 

(8)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Pettle, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Pettle, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Pettle, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(d)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(11)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(12)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(13)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(14)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(15)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation into my office administration practices in my obstetrics and gynecology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Pettle will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months. 

Dr. Pettle will engage in professional education in uninsured services and block fees.

Dr. Pettle's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Pettle, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(16)	I, Dr. Pettle, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(17)	I, Dr. Pettle, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18)	I, Dr. Pettle, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;

(c)	any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(d)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  

(e)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.


(2 of 2)
As from December 4, 2006, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Alvin Pettle, in
accordance with an undertaking provided by Dr. Pettle to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

I have voluntarily relinquished my prescribing privileges with respect to
Narcotic drugs and Narcotic preparations as set out in Schedules I
through IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C. 1996, c.19,
and summarized as follows:
                  
                  
                  Drugs/Substances                           Relinquished
                  
                  Narcotic Drugs                                            yes
                  Narcotic Preparations                                  yes
                  Controlled Drugs                                         no
                  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances        no


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 21, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Alvin Pettle to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 21, 2021:

Following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation into my office administration practices in my obstetrics and gynecology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Pettle will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Pettle will engage in professional education in uninsured services and block fees.

Dr. Pettle’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and Professional Education.