THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:55:13 AM
Pettle, Alvin
CPSO#:
22872
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Aug 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
3910 Bathurst Street
M3H5Z3
Toronto ON M3H5Z3
Phone: (416) 633-4101
Fax: (416) 633-9254
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:11 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1995 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 1995 |
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee |
Effective: 10 Feb 1999 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 04 Dec 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 02 Apr 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 20 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 21 May 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 02 Aug 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 02 Aug 2022 |
|
Active |