skip to content

Petrof, Elaine Olga

CPSO#: 88179

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2008
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Division of Infectious Diseases
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 533-6000 Ext. 75471
Fax: (613) 533-6863 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Petrof & Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Sep 2012

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012 Active
             1.    Dr. Elaine Olga Petrof may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Infectious Diseases, Queen's University, in which Dr.
                        Petrof holds an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank  of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.  Petrof no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.