THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:04:43 PM
Petrof, Elaine Olga
CPSO#:
88179
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Petrof & Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:27 Nov 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 Nov 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Apr 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |