skip to content

Peters, Daniel Albert

CPSO#: 86743

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13712
Fax: (613) 761-4041 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Daniel A. Peters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Peters ( CPSO# 86743 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
P O Box 213
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL ALBERT PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2008