THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
08/05/24 0:26:58 AM
Peters, Daniel Albert
CPSO#:
86743
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13712
Fax: (613) 761-4041
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL ALBERT PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2008 |