skip to content

Perez D'Empaire, Pablo Adolfo

CPSO#: 92487

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Del Zulia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Room M3-200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-4804864
Fax: 416-480-6039 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Perez D'Empaire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Perez D'Empaire ( CPSO# 92487 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M3-200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PABLO ADOLFO PEREZ D'EMPAIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREZ D'EMPAIRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2010 to 19 May 2010
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 04 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 04 Dec 2015 to 03 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 04 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017