THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:02:03 AM
Perez D'Empaire, Pablo Adolfo
CPSO#:
92487
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Del Zulia, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Room M3-200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-4804864
Fax: 416-480-6039
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PABLO ADOLFO PEREZ D'EMPAIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREZ D'EMPAIRE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2010 to 19 May 2010
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 04 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 04 Dec 2015 to 03 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 04 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |