skip to content

Pereira, Felipe Andrade

CPSO#: 90993

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Nov 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:31 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 27 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 27 Jul 2011 to 26 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 27 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2016