THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:24:52 AM
Pereira, Felipe Andrade
CPSO#:
90993
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: University of Ottawa, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:31 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 27 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 27 Jul 2011 to 26 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 27 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2016 |