skip to content

Peeva, Valentina Kosta

CPSO#: 89857

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: ST CYRIL AND METHODIUS UNIVERSITY, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7181 Yonge St
Enhanced Care Clinic
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C7 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

825 Don Mills Rd
Don Mills Medical Clinic
North York ON  M3C 1V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 383-1251
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peeva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Peeva ( CPSO# 89857 )

Business Address:
48 North Hills Terr
North York ON  M3C 1M6
Phone Number: 4167291780

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6139


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Macedonia

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  July 8, 2022
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 11, 2022,  Runnymede Healthcare Centre (the “Hospital”) notified the College, pursuant to s.33(1)(c) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Schedule 2 of the Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Peeva resigned her privileges from the Hospital  effective July 8, 2022 in connection with concerns raised about Dr. Peeva’s practice.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:24 Jan 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2008 to 02 Dec 2008
PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Oct 2009
CF - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2019 Active
             Dr. Valentina Kosta Peeva may practise medicine independently in internal
            medicine.