THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:54:46 PM
Peeva, Valentina Kosta
CPSO#:
89857
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: ST CYRIL AND METHODIUS UNIVERSITY, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7181 Yonge St
Enhanced Care Clinic
Thornhill ON L3T 0C7
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Macedonia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Jan 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2008 to 02 Dec 2008
PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Oct 2009
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jan 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jan 2019 |
|
Active |