skip to content

Payne, Robert Paul

CPSO#: 85028

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (416)224-9501 Ext. 0
Fax: (905) 294-9499 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT PAUL PAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAYNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2014