THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:59:31 PM
Payne, Robert Paul
CPSO#:
85028
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Calgary, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
Phone: (416)224-9501 Ext. 0
Fax: (905) 294-9499
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT PAUL PAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAYNE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2014 |