skip to content

Phillips, Patrick Brian

CPSO#: 109364

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 03 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Sep 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: PATRICK PHILLIPS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Phillips ( CPSO# 109364)

Business Address:
61 Fifth St
Englehart ON  P0J 1H0
Phone Number: 705 544 2301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Blanche River Health Englehart
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 2, 2022
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On February 9, 2022, Blanche River Health notified the College, pursuant to s. 85.5(1) of the Regulated Health Professions Act, that Blanche River Health has temporarily suspended the privileges of Dr. Patrick Phillips, effective February 2, 2022.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 03 May 2022

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Patrick Brian Phillips’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now called the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Phillips engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his communications, including communications on social media and other digital platforms, regarding the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues. This includes making misleading, incorrect or inflammatory statements about vaccinations, treatments and public health measures for COVID-19. It is also alleged that Dr. Phillips is incompetent in relation to his communications. It is further alleged that Dr. Phillips engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to posting College investigative information online and failing to remove this information upon request, and in relation to failing to cooperate with the College’s investigation and failing to provide information and records requested by the College. 

 

It is also alleged that Dr. Phillips failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and that he is incompetent in his care of patients and in his reporting of adverse events following immunization; and that he engaged in conduct relating to COVID-19, including in respect of patients, that would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 

 

It is also alleged that Dr. Phillips breached a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration and/or engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, by failing to comply with ancillary terms of an interim Order, including failing to provide patient charts and other information requested by the College. 

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion: 2022.09.07; Hearing Case Management: 2022.10.21; Motion: 2022.11.23

Hearing Status: Adjourned