THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:45:10 AM
Phillips, Patrick Brian
CPSO#:
109364
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
06 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Sep 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: PATRICK PHILLIPS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: February 2, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On February 9, 2022, Blanche River Health notified the College, pursuant to s. 85.5(1) of the Regulated Health Professions Act, that Blanche River Health has temporarily suspended the privileges of Dr. Patrick Phillips, effective February 2, 2022.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2018 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 27 Sep 2021 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2022 |
Revocation by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 06 Jun 2023 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 06 Jun 2023
Summary:
On June 6, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Phillips engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College and contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration, in relation to his:- communication of misleading, incorrect or inflammatory statements regarding the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues;
- online disclosure of a private letter received from an Associate Medical Officer of Health;
- interference with testing of an infant, who was not his patient, for COVID-19;
- online disclosure of College investigative materials;
- failure to cooperate with the College’s investigation; and
- failure to comply with an Interim Order imposed by the College.
The Tribunal also found that Dr. Phillips is incompetent.
The Tribunal ordered that:
1. Dr. Phillips attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar revoke the member’s certificate of registration, effective immediately; and
3. Dr. Phillips pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by July 6, 2023.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Statement of Uncontested Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Case Management: 2022-10-21; Motions: 2022-09-07; 2022-11-23; 2023-03-10; Merits: 2023-06-06