skip to content

Pasic, Ivan

CPSO#: 98110

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Nov 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Oncology and Haematology
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave
700U Room 6-606
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 416-946-4501 Ext. 4997
Fax: 416-946-4563 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ivan Pasic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Pasic ( CPSO# 98110 )

Business Address:
64 Eagle Rd
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 4J2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:31 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IVAN PASIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 13 Nov 2019
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016