THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 22:14:25 PM
Pasic, Ivan
CPSO#:
98110
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Serbian
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Oncology and Haematology
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave
700U Room 6-606
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: 416-946-4501 Ext. 4997
Fax: 416-946-4563
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:31 Oct 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IVAN PASIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 13 Nov 2019
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Nov 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2016 |