skip to content

Papadopoulos, Anastasios Stacey

CPSO#: 86674

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Allergy Group
650 Sammon Ave, S 404
East York, ON
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone: (416) 465-7999
Fax: (416) 461-8999 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anastasios Papadopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Papadopoulos ( CPSO# 86674 )
Dr. L. Liontos ( CPSO# 98488 )

Business Address:
Toronto Allergy Group
Suite 404
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 465-7999

Business Address:
B204 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:20 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANASTASIOS STACEY PAPADOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPADOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2011