skip to content

Panosyan, Francis Bartholomew

CPSO#: 91151

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2019
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
705 MacKay St
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: 6137323422 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FRANCIS BARTHOLOMEW PANOSYAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PANOSYAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. PANOSYAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PANOSYAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PANOSYAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PANOSYAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PANOSYAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2021.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021