THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:20:48 PM
Panosyan, Francis Bartholomew
CPSO#:
91151
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200-2437 Princess St
Kingston ON K7M 3G1
Phone: 613-546-6652
Fax: 613-344-1365
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2021 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FRANCIS BARTHOLOMEW PANOSYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANOSYAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2021 |