Pankratieva, Elena (CPSO#: 99671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 2014

Expiry Date:  24 Jan 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Sep 2014

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI -The Doctor's Office
Royal Bank Plaza, Lower Concourse
200 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2J3
Phone: (416) 368-6787
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI the Doctor's Office
First Canadian Place
100 King Street West,
Lower Concourse
Toronto ON  M5X 1A4
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-1200
Fax: (416) 867-1201
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elena Pankratieva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pankratieva ( CPSO# 99671 )

Business Address:
MCI-The Doctors Office
Royal Bank Plaza Lower Concourse
200 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2J3
Phone Number: (416) 368-6787

Business Address:
MCI-The Doctors Office
First Canadian Place-Lower Concourse
100 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 867-1200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 11 Jan 2013
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 17 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Feb 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 24 Jan 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Feb 2019 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.   Elena   Pankratieva  may  practise  family  medicine,  while  under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College, at the
                  following locations:

                  (i)   MCI The Doctor's  Office  at  Royal Bank Plaza in Toronto, Ontario;
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  MCI  The  Doctor's  Office  at First  Canadian  Place  in  Toronto,
                        Ontario.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration will  automatically expire on January 24,
                  2020.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Pankratieva's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or  attitude, does not
                        provide the required reports to the College by the  due  date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Pankratieva's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the  on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Pankratieva's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on September 18, 2014, and will expire on  or
                  before January 24, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.