THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:11:07 AM
Maric, Elena
CPSO#:
99671
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Pankratieva, Elena (used until: 02 Jun 2021 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Phone: 613 680 1065
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Sep 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 11 Jan 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Sep 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Feb 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Sep 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Sep 2019 |
|
Active |