skip to content

Panabaker, James Paul

CPSO#: 17894

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jun 1961

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 5-Aug-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Dr. Panabaker has advised that his medical records were turned over to his colleagues at:

Georgetown Medical Associates
1A Princess Anne
Halton Hills, ON
L7G 4N4
 
The remaining medical records were sent to:

Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. 
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6

Tel: 416-398-0638
Toll free: 1-888-563-3732
Website: www.rsrs.com 
Date Received: 11 Jul 2013


Instructions/Address:

Patients looking to access a copy of their medical record should send a written request to:

Huron Shores FHT
527 Causley Street
Blind River, ON 
P0R 1B0
Date Received: 24 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013