THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 22:01:45 PM
Panabaker, James Paul
CPSO#:
17894
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jun 1961
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
5-Aug-2014
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Panabaker has advised that his medical records were turned over to his colleagues at:
Georgetown Medical Associates
1A Princess Anne
Halton Hills, ON
L7G 4N4
The remaining medical records were sent to:
Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6
Tel: 416-398-0638
Toll free: 1-888-563-3732
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 11 Jul 2013
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to access a copy of their medical record should send a written request to:
Huron Shores FHT
527 Causley Street
Blind River, ON
P0R 1B0
Date Received: 24 May 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1960 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1961 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |