skip to content

Pampaloni, Federico

CPSO#: 92029

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Florence, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 319
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (289) 863-7412
Fax: (289) 863-7413 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ancaster Endoscopy Inc
Suite 205
1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 304-0062
Fax: (905) 304-0058
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

GHA Surgical Centre
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-5743
Fax: (905) 575-7711
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pampaloni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Pampaloni ( CPSO# 92029 )

Business Address:
710 Dorval Drive
Suite 202
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Phone Number: (905) 607-0022

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:10 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FEDERICO PAMPALONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAMPALONI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
PEAP - CF - General Surgery

McMaster University, 17 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Trauma General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2013