THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:29:59 AM
Pampaloni, Federico
CPSO#:
92029
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Florence, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 319
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: (289) 863-7412
Fax: (289) 863-7413
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:10 Jul 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FEDERICO PAMPALONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAMPALONI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 17 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Trauma General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2013 |