skip to content

Pambrun, Chantale Alice

CPSO#: 93654

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Blood Services
1800 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa ON  K1G 4J5
Phone: (613) 739-2513 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pambrun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pambrun ( CPSO# 93654 )

Business Address:
Canadian Blood Services
1800 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa ON  K1G 4J5
Phone Number: (613) 739-2300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHANTALE ALICE PAMBRUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAMBRUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2010 to 16 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2011 to 09 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016