THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:26:45 AM
Pambrun, Chantale Alice
CPSO#:
93654
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Calgary, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Blood Services
1800 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa ON K1G 4J5
Phone: (613) 739-2513
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Pambrun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:10 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHANTALE ALICE PAMBRUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAMBRUN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2010 to 16 Jul 2010
EL - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2011 to 09 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2016 |