skip to content

Palframan, David Seymour

CPSO#: 24166

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Sep 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D.S. Palframan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 20 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 2110 Applewood Crescent Ottawa ON K1H 6B5
Date Received: 24 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2019