THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:07:43 AM
Palframan, David Seymour
CPSO#:
24166
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Sep 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: D.S. Palframan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 20 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:2110 Applewood Crescent
Ottawa ON K1H 6B5
Date Received: 24 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Mar 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2019 |