Pacione, Laura Rosanne (CPSO#: 99036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
114 Maitland Street
Toronto ON  M4Y1E1
Phone: (416) 924-1164 Ext. 3208
Fax: (416) 924-8208
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ROSANNE PACIONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACIONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2012 to 27 Jul 2012
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016