THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:12:31 AM
Pacione, Laura Rosanne
CPSO#:
99036
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
114 Maitland Street
Toronto ON M4Y1E1
Phone: (416) 924-1164 Ext. 3208
Fax: (416) 924-8208
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAURA ROSANNE PACIONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACIONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2012 to 27 Jul 2012
EL - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2016 |