skip to content

Wong, Philip Ernest

CPSO#: 30270

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Corporation Name: Philip E. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wong ( CPSO# 30270 )

Business Address:
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9477

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIP ERNEST WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1978