skip to content

Seth, Puneet

CPSO#: 90639

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bay and College Medical Centre
790 Bay Street #108
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 921-2121 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-5185
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P. Seth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Seth ( CPSO# 90639 )
Dr. M. Poddar ( CPSO# 93361 )

Business Address:
34 Ellis Park Road
Woodstock ON  M6S 2V3
Phone Number: (416) 671-5114


Corporation Name: M. Poddar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Seth ( CPSO# 90639 )
Dr. M. Poddar ( CPSO# 93361 )

Business Address:
Suite 1500
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 237-0104

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Suite 2D
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2

Business Address:
Suite 402
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PUNEET SETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011