skip to content

Oglaza, Piotr Przemyslaw

CPSO#: 87777

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Oct 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
221 Portsmouth Ave
Kingston ON  K7M 1V5
Phone: 613 549 1232 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

804 John Marks Ave
Kingston ON  K7K 0J7
Canada
Phone: 613 507 7003
Fax: 613 507 7006
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P. Oglaza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Oglaza ( CPSO# 87777 )

Business Address:
1032 Mona Dr
Kingston ON  K7P 2P6

Business Address:
804 John Marks Ave
Kingston ON  K7K 0J7
Phone Number: 613 507 7003

Business Address:
1311 Grace Avenue
Kingston ON  K7P 3K6
Phone Number: (613) 583-5507


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Denmark

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:02 Nov 2009 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PIOTR PRZEMYSLAW OGLAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGLAZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 23 Oct 2007 to 07 Jan 2008
AVP - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Jan 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2008 to 22 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2009 to 22 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2009