skip to content

Osadchy, Alla Vladimirovna

CPSO#: 87763

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:National Medical University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yonge Crosby Medical Clinic
Suite 304
10376 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B8
Phone: (905) 883-4777
Fax: (905) 883-8777 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alla Osadchy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Osadchy ( CPSO# 87763 )

Business Address:
Yonge-Crosby Medical Clinic
Suite 304
10376 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B8
Phone Number: (905) 883-4777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLA VLADIMIROVNA OSADCHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSADCHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 May 2011
CF - Clinical Pharmacology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2013