THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:01:08 AM
Osadchy, Alla Vladimirovna
CPSO#:
87763
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: National Medical University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Yonge Crosby Medical Clinic
Suite 304
10376 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3B8
Phone: (905) 883-4777
Fax: (905) 883-8777
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALLA VLADIMIROVNA OSADCHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSADCHY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Clinical Pharmacology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 May 2011
CF - Clinical Pharmacology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |