skip to content

Orkin, Aaron Michael

CPSO#: 86358

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dalla Lana School of Public Health
155 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 3M7
Canada
Phone: (416) 978-2058
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 416 242 1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E. 2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: 416-591-4411
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:14 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AARON MICHAEL ORKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University Of Toronto, 16 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009