THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 23:40:59 PM
Orkin, Aaron Michael
CPSO#:
86358
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:14 Oct 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AARON MICHAEL ORKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORKIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |