skip to content

Omole, Mojola

CPSO#: 86905

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
272 Charlotte St. Suite 302
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 874-5222
Fax: 7058745224 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

4800 Leslie St. unit 304
North York ON  M2J 2K9
Canada
Phone: 4164467626
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mojola Omole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Omole ( CPSO# 86905 )

Business Address:
302-272 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: 7058745222

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
304-4800 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 446-7626

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOJOLA OMOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMOLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2013