THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:59:10 AM
Omole, Mojola
CPSO#:
86905
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
402-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Phone: 4162825595
Fax: 4162820157
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mojola Omole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 23 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOJOLA OMOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMOLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2013 |